This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 at 03:46:05 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS DANIEL M LEON

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION against DANIEL M LEON in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4038

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

LEON DANIEL M

LEON DANIEL M.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

7/15/2019: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

Declaration of Mailing - Declaration of Mailing

5/13/2019: Declaration of Mailing - Declaration of Mailing

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/24/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/24/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

4/24/2019: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • Updated -- Amended Complaint 1st: Name Extension: 1st; As To Parties changed from DANIEL M LEON (Defendant) to DANIEL M LEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Amended Complaint; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL M LEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • amended complaint; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL M. LEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL M LEON (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/06/2019; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL M LEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL M LEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LOS ANGELES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL M LEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC04038    Hearing Date: March 04, 2020    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

los angeles federal credit union,

Plaintiff,

vs.

daniel m. leon, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

19STLC04038

Hearing Date:

March 4, 2020

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

ORDER RE:

PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Plaintiff Los Angeles Federal Credit Union (“Plaintiff”) requests that the Court enter default judgment against Defendant Daniel M. Leon (“Defendant”) in the total amount of $36,895.06. Plaintiff also seeks to foreclose on the underlying security agreements and requests that the judgment include an order that possession of the security (certain vehicles) be awarded to Plaintiff.

The Court finds that the request is sufficiently supported by the submitted declarations and evidence. Accordingly, the Court grants Plaintiff’s request and will sign the judgment. No appearance is necessary.

DATED: March 4, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court