Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2017 at 11:02:37 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY VS SAFEWAY, INC (COMPANY) (C1543561), ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAFEWAY, INC COMPANY C1543561 . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5558

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Defendants

SAFEWAY INC COMPANY C1543561

DEL RIO ARMANDO

 

Court Documents

By Los Angeles Metropolitan Transportation Authority

9/6/2017: By Los Angeles Metropolitan Transportation Authority

Unknown

9/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/7/2017: Unknown

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/19/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department NE2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Los Angeles Metropolitan Transportation Authority; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Updated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from 09/06/2017 to 09/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff); As to: Safeway, Inc (Company) (C1543561) (Defendant); Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/28/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff); As to: Armando Del Rio (Defendant); Service Cost: 49.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Plaintiff); As to: Safeway, Inc (Company) (C1543561) (Defendant); Armando Del Rio (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0015251 (Exempt GC 6103); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT is a litigant