This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 14:18:13 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METRO VS EDGAR, JOHN BRADFORD

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 LOS ANGELES COUNTY METRO filed an Other lawsuit against EDGAR, JOHN BRADFORD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4737

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METRO

Defendant

EDGAR JOHN BRADFORD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DECISION- ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL, JOHN BRADFORD EDGAR NOTICE OF DECISION- ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL, JOHN BRADFORD EDGAR REVERSED, ANY MONEY PAID TO BE REFUNDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/02/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED-REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE NOTICE OF APPEAL-ADMINISTRATIVE HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketPARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketAPPELLANT/RESPONDENT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketPARKING CITATION NO #P1132134 PARKING CITATION NO #P1132134

    Read MoreRead Less