Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 01:22:57 (UTC).

LORISA CORPORATION VS DAVID JOBANY FLORES

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by LORISA CORPORATION against DAVID JOBANY FLORES in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6099

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORISA CORPORATION DBA SU CASA DE DESCUENTO

Defendant

FLORES DAVID JOBANY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/13/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/4/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/4/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Lorisa Corporation DBA Su Casa de Descuento against Defendant David Jobany Flores on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lorisa Corporation on 11/26/2018 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $2,550.00.; Other: Judgment Debtor's Statement of Assets is mailed to Judgment Debtor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 02/04/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Lorisa Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: David Jobany Flores (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/07/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: Lorisa Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: David Jobany Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less