This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2021 at 11:22:43 (UTC).

LORI MARIE WACOCHE VS WALMART, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2020 LORI MARIE WACOCHE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WALMART, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1155

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WACOCHE LORI MARIE

Defendants

RELIABLE PROPERTIES AKA RELIABLE PROPERTIES INC

WALMART INC.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/18/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

11/18/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 11/18/2020

11/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 11/18/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19)) of 11/13/2020

11/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19)) of 11/13/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19))

11/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Remote Appearance Information Packet

7/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Remote Appearance Information Packet

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

6/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/23/2020

6/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/23/2020

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/8/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/29/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/4/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

5/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/08/2020

5/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/08/2020

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/30/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/1/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/01/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/01/2020, Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Shee

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/01/2020, Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Shee

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Lori Marie Wacoche (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 11/18/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lori Marie Wacoche on 03/30/2020, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDismissal entered on 11/13/2020, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19)) of 11/13/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lori Marie Wacoche on 03/30/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (CONT: COVID-19) scheduled for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 11/13/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/01/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial (MASS CONT. RE: COVID-19) scheduled for 08/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/01/2020, Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lori Marie Wacoche (Plaintiff); As to: Walmart, Inc. (Defendant); Reliable Properties (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Donna Hollingsworth in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RELIABLE PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant