This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2019 at 07:32:06 (UTC).

LORENZO HADAR VS RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 LORENZO HADAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2855

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HADAR LORENZO

Defendant

RELIANCE HOME SERVICES INC

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/22/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/22/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/7/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/7/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/7/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 05/22/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LORENZO HADAR on 03/07/2019 as follows: Defendant RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC does not owe the plaintiff LORENZO HADAR any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LORENZO HADAR (Plaintiff); As to: RELIANCE HOME SERVICES, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RELIANCE HOME SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant