Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2017 at 09:22:19 (UTC).

LORENA BECERRA, ET AL. VS HARJIT SINGH

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 LORENA BECERRA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARJIT SINGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRDAUS F. DORDI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6251

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

FIRDAUS F. DORDI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BECERRA LORENA

GARCIA CRYSTAL

GARCIA DAVID

GARCIA AMY

Defendant

SINGH HARJIT

 

Court Documents

(Compliance Hearing)

11/17/2017: (Compliance Hearing)

Minute Order (Compliance Hearing) of 11/17/2017

11/17/2017: Minute Order (Compliance Hearing) of 11/17/2017

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/17/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/17/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/17/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

10/17/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/17/2017

10/17/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/17/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/12/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017

9/12/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • Minute Order (Compliance Hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Compliance Hearing) of 11/17/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Compliance Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 11/17/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: David Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Amy Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Updated -- Amy Garcia (Plaintiff): First Name changed from AMY to Amy; Last Name changed from GARCIA to Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Updated -- Crystal Garcia (Plaintiff): First Name changed from CRYSTAL to Crystal; Last Name changed from GARCIA to Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Updated -- David Garcia (Plaintiff): First Name changed from DAVID to David; Last Name changed from GARCIA to Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Updated -- Lorena Becerra (Plaintiff): First Name changed from LORENA to Lorena; Last Name changed from BECERRA to Becerra

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • Updated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/12/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department Z Held - Continued to 10/17/2017 08:30 AM at 10/17/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: LORENA BECERRA (Plaintiff); DAVID GARCIA (Plaintiff); AMY GARCIA (Plaintiff); CRYSTAL GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: HARJIT SINGH (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LORENA BECERRA (Plaintiff); DAVID GARCIA (Plaintiff); AMY GARCIA (Plaintiff); CRYSTAL GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: HARJIT SINGH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0015252 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Firdaus F. Dordi at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less