This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2019 at 03:38:03 (UTC).

LOREN BARNHART, ET AL. VS AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 LOREN BARNHART filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY MORENO PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2829

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY MORENO PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEREZ ELODIA

BARNHART LOREN

Defendants

AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC

FPI MANAGEMENT

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

10/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/17/2019

10/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/17/2019

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/17/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loren Barnhart, et al. on 08/19/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 10/17/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC (Defendant); FPI Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/17/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC (Defendant) to AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC (Defendant), FPI Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC (Defendant) to AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC (Defendant), FPI Management (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loren Barnhart (Plaintiff); Elodia Perez (Plaintiff); As to: AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Anthony Moreno Peters in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant