Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 00:48:46 (UTC).

MIRANDA, RAFAEL D VS MANUKIAN, ASHOT

Case Summary

On 12/30/2015 MIRANDA, RAFAEL D filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MANUKIAN, ASHOT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6089

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ LUIS E

MIRANDA RAFAEL D

Defendants

MANUKIAN ASHOT

MANUKIAN MARINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIRANDA RAFAEL D

Defendant Attorney

POGOSYAN TONY

 

Court Documents

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

6/19/2017: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

Amended Complaint - (Amended)

6/19/2017: Amended Complaint - (Amended)

(name extension) - REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

6/19/2017: (name extension) - REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

Proof of Service by Mail

1/9/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/15/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/17/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

5/7/2018: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/22/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/9/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...) of 03/04/2019

3/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...) of 03/04/2019

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/14/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration)

5/16/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration)

Reply (name extension) - Reply [TO SUPPORT OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF MINUTE ORDER OF MARCH 4, 2019 DENYING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGM

5/17/2019: Reply (name extension) - Reply [TO SUPPORT OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF MINUTE ORDER OF MARCH 4, 2019 DENYING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGM

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration) of 05/22/2019

5/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration) of 05/22/2019

Notice (name extension) - Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Continuance of Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration

6/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Continuance of Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

7/2/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition [SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION]

7/2/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition [SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration)

7/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • Hearingat 0830 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by MIRANDA, RAFAEL D on 06/19/2017, judgment entered on 07/25/2018 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by MIRANDA, RAFAEL D on 06/19/2017, judgment entered on 07/25/2018 as to MARINA MANUKIAN is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by MIRANDA, RAFAEL D on 06/19/2017, judgment entered on 07/25/2018 as to ASHOT MANUKIAN is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration) of 07/15/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other Reconsideration scheduled for 07/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 07/15/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/30/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketOSC SET 12/31/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: RAFAEL D MIRANDA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -CASE FILING FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint Breach of Contract: Status Date changed from 06/19/2017 to 12/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 15K16089    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: 26

Miranda v. Manukian, et al.

MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

(CCP § 1008)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant’s Motion for Reconsideration of the Order of Dismissal is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Rafael D. Miranda (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of contract, promissory fraud, and common counts against Defendants Ashot Manukian and Marina Manukian on December 30, 2015. A First Amended Complaint was filed on June 19, 2017. On September 18, 2019, Defendants filed a Notice of Vexatious Litigant Order Pursuant to CCP § 391.7(c) regarding Plaintiff. On October 9, 2019, the Court dismissed Plaintiffs’ action for failure to obtain a prefiling order from the presiding judge. Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Reconsideration of the Court’s October 9, 2019 order of dismissal on October 21, 2019. Defendants filed an opposition on March 5, 2020 and Plaintiff replied on July 27, 2020.

The Court finds it lacks jurisdiction to rule on the Motion for Reconsideration. (APRI Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (1999) 76 Cal.App.4th 176, 182 [“Once the trial court has entered judgment [of dismissal], it is without power to grant reconsideration.”].) The Court signed the order of dismissal on October 9, 2019 and therefore is without power to rule on a motion for reconsideration.

The Motion for Reconsideration is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Court clerk to give notice.