Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2021 at 06:10:19 (UTC).

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER filed an Other lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1221

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Defendant

PRUSSAK WELCH & AVILA INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA SHOGO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BABADJIANIAN CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/15/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

2/19/2021: Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

2/19/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

2/10/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

7/28/2020: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/28/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

7/28/2020: Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

4/10/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

2/7/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/7/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/7/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • Hearing02/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Hearing08/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Cross-Complaint: As To Parties changed from Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff), Prussak, Welch & Avila, Inc., a corporation (Cross-Defendant) to Prussak, Welch & Avila, Inc., a corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 02/19/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Prussak, Welch & Avila, Inc., a corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant); As to: Prussak, Welch & Avila, Inc., a corporation (Cross-Defendant); Service Date: 02/23/2021; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant); As to: Prussak, Welch & Avila, Inc., a corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant); As to: Prussak, Welch & Avila, Inc., a corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint scheduled for 02/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 02/10/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 02/10/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC01221    Hearing Date: February 10, 2021    Dept: 26


Case Number: 20STLC04562    Hearing Date: February 10, 2021    Dept: 26

COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES;

REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2030.310)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Francisco Delgado’s Motion to Compel Further Response to Special Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Based on the relief sought in the Cross-Complaint, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Defendant / Cross-Complainant is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

Plaintiff Francisco Delgado’s Motion to Compel Further Response to Form Interrogatories and Request for Sanctions set for hearing on February 11, 2021 is advanced to this date and vacated.

ANALYSIS:

On May 29, 2020, Plaintiff Francisco Delgado (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of contract against Defendant Commercial Medical Residential Construction, Inc. (“Defendant”). On July 8, 2020, Defendant filed a Cross-Complaint against Plaintiff for breach of contract and negligence and seeks damages of $70,000.00. (Cross-Compl., p. 6:26-28.)

As a limited jurisdiction court, this Court lacks jurisdiction to grant damages in excess of $25,000.00. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86, subd. (a).) Based on the relief sought in the Cross-Complaint, this case is reclassified as an unlimited civil case and transferred to the Reclassification/Transfer Desk for collection of fees and reassignment of the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Defendant is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRUSSAK WELCH & AVILA INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BABADJANIAN CHRISTOPHER