This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 13:27:40 (UTC).

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER filed an Other lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8005

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

PARA-ZUNIGA LIZETTE

RAHM LAW GROUP A.P.C.

RAHMANOU MICHAEL F.

RAHM LAW GROUP A PROF. CORP.

PARRA-ZUNIGA LIZETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA SHOGO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

VIDANA AMERICA

HOWE PATRICK

Cross Defendant Attorney

BAZZO ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/7/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/26/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/27/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

4/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

4/19/2021: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

3/16/2021: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

3/16/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

3/16/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons Cross-Complaint

3/16/2021: Summons - Summons Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

3/16/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - Answer

3/16/2021: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/9/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer - Answer

10/23/2020: Answer - Answer

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Long Beach Memorial Medical Center on 09/22/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Long Beach Memorial Medical Center as to Geico Indemnity Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, and Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Geico Indemnity Company on 03/16/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Geico Indemnity Company as to MICHAEL F. RAHMANOU, RAHM LAW GROUP, A.P.C., and LIZETTE PARRA-ZUNIGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, et al. on 03/16/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Select Insurance Company as to Lizette Para-Zuniga, Rahm Law Group, A Prof. Corp., and Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Geico Indemnity Company (Cross-Defendant); As to: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- ROBERT BAZZO (Attorney): First Name changed from Robert to ROBERT; Last Name changed from Bazzo to BAZZO; Organization Name changed from Freeman, Mathis & Gary to Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP; Middle Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Geico Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant); As to: MICHAEL F. RAHMANOU (Cross-Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/07/2021; Service Cost: 107.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Geico Indemnity Company (Cross-Complainant); As to: RAHM LAW GROUP, A.P.C. (Cross-Defendant); Service Date: 04/02/2021; Service Cost: 102.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant); Progressive Select Insurance Company (Cross-Complainant); As to: Lizette Para-Zuniga (Cross-Defendant); Rahm Law Group, A Prof. Corp. (Cross-Defendant); Geico Indemnity Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); As to: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); As to: Geico Indemnity Company (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); As to: Geico Indemnity Company (Defendant); Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); As to: Geico Indemnity Company (Defendant); Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Long Beach Memorial Medical Center (Plaintiff); As to: Geico Indemnity Company (Defendant); Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant