This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 08:33:40 (UTC).

LONDON & CO., LLP VS LOREN GRANICH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 LONDON CO , LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOREN GRANICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7455

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONDON & CO. LLP

Defendants

GRANICH LOREN

HEY GIRL WORLDWIDE LLC DBA RHONDA INTL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/1/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/1/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/1/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • Hearing09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • Hearing03/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: London & Co., LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Loren Granich (Defendant); Service Date: 10/03/2020; Service Cost: 130.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: London & Co., LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Hey Girl Worldwide, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 09/04/2020; Service Cost: 170.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: London & Co., LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Loren Granich (Defendant); Hey Girl Worldwide, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: London & Co., LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Loren Granich (Defendant); Hey Girl Worldwide, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: London & Co., LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Loren Granich (Defendant); Hey Girl Worldwide, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONDON & CO. LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WRIGHT ANDREW