Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 08:59:44 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP VS GONZALEZ, NICOLE MARIE

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GONZALEZ, NICOLE MARIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3936

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP

Defendants

GONZALEZ ANTHONY

GONZALEZ NICOLE MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOBEL, GARY DEAN

LOBEL GARY DEAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/3/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/25/2017

8/25/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/25/2017

Minute Order - (Court Order)

8/25/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/31/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2017: Request for Dismissal

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

8/31/2017: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

8/31/2017: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Memorandum (name extension) - RE: BALANCE MEMORANDUM

8/31/2017: Memorandum (name extension) - RE: BALANCE MEMORANDUM

Judgment

9/21/2017: Judgment

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/20/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

2/1/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

5/14/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

5/31/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP (Plaintiff); As to: NICOLE MARIE GONZALEZ (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP (Plaintiff); As to: NICOLE MARIE GONZALEZ (Defendant); ANTHONY GONZALEZ (Defendant); Costs: 117.00; Interest: 840.84; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 02/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Attorney; As to: NICOLE MARIE GONZALEZ (Defendant); ANTHONY GONZALEZ (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 108.68; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/25/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP (Plaintiff); As to: NICOLE MARIE GONZALEZ (Defendant); ANTHONY GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to NICOLE MARIE GONZALEZ; ANTHONY GONZALEZ; On the Complaint filed by LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP on 03/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/01/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 03/30/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOBEL, GARY D