This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2019 at 00:05:24 (UTC).

LOANTOPIA LLC VS VALENTIN BELTRAN

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 LOANTOPIA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VALENTIN BELTRAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3178

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANTOPIA LLC DBA SHORESIDE LOANS LLC DBA SHORESIDE CAPITAL LLC

Po Box 882140

Los Angeles, CA 90009

Defendant

BELTRAN VALENTIN

Sout Gate, CA 90280

 

Court Documents

(San Mateo)

8/17/2017: (San Mateo)

(San Francisco)

8/2/2017: (San Francisco)

(Los Angeles)

8/2/2017: (Los Angeles)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

6/21/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/21/2017: Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/23/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/25/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (San Mateo): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Writ of Execution (San Mateo); Filed by: County: San Mateo; Principal: 2,610.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (San Mateo): Status changed from Filed to Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Writ of Execution (San Francisco); Filed by: County: San Francisco; Principal: 2,610.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Valentin Beltran (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/18/2017; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170426E7938 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170426E7938 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Valentin Beltran (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less