This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2019 at 00:05:29 (UTC).

LOANTOPIA LLC VS LYNDA ABAN

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 LOANTOPIA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LYNDA ABAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3198

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANTOPIA LLC DBA SHORESIDE LOANS LLC DBA SHORESIDE CAPITAL LLC

Po Box 882140

Los Angeles, CA 90009

Defendant

ABAN LYNDA

Long Beach, CA 90806

 

Court Documents

Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

7/18/2017: Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment

[Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment]

7/18/2017: [Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment]

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

7/14/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order of 07/14/2017

7/14/2017: Minute Order of 07/14/2017

Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

6/28/2017: Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer

[Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]

6/28/2017: [Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment and Answer]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/21/2017: Minute Order of 06/21/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/22/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/10/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/25/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/21/2018 ; Status Date changed from 05/11/2018 to 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lynda Aban (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 05/11/2018 ; Status Date changed from 06/21/2017 to 05/11/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 05/11/2018 ; Status Date changed from 05/11/2018 to 05/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lynda Aban (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment; Signed and Filed by: As to: Lynda Aban (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Correct or Cancel Judgment]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/21/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Loantopia LLC DBA Shoreside Capital LLC, DBA Shoreside Loans LLC against Defendant Lynda Aban on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loantopia LLC on 04/25/2017 for the principal amount of $2,465.70 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $2,565.70, joint and several.; Other: Default judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lynda Aban (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170426E8215 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170426E8215 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lynda Aban (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less