This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2019 at 23:58:01 (UTC).

LOANTOPIA LLC VS FRANSUI BURUSHYAN

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 LOANTOPIA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANSUI BURUSHYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3176

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANTOPIA LLC DBA SHORESIDE LOANS LLC DBA SHORESIDE CAPITAL LLC

Po Box 882140

Los Angeles, CA 90009

Defendant

BURUSHYAN FRANSUI

Glendale, CA 91204

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

8/22/2018: Writ - Return

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

5/14/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

8/2/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

6/21/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/21/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/21/2017

6/21/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/21/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/21/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/25/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 167.00; Interest Credits: 123.40; Principal Credits: 2,451.60; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 08/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 05/15/2018 ; Status Date changed from 06/21/2017 to 05/15/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 05/15/2018 ; Status Date changed from 05/15/2018 to 05/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Fransui Burushyan (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Filed by: County: Los Angeles; Principal: 2,610.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Loantopia LLC DBA Shoreside Capital LLC, DBA Shoreside Loans LLC against Defendant Fransui Burushyan on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loantopia LLC on 04/25/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $110.00 for a total of $2,610.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Fransui Burushyan (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/04/2017; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170426E8010 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170426E8010 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Fransui Burushyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less