This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2020 at 22:30:04 (UTC).

LOANTOPIA LLC VS CELESTE LYTLE

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 LOANTOPIA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CELESTE LYTLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3190

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANTOPIA LLC DBA SHORESIDE LOANS LLC DBA SHORESIDE CAPITAL LLC

Po Box 882140

Los Angeles, CA 90009

Defendant

LYTLE CELESTE

Glendale, CA 91202

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

8/22/2018: Writ - Return

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

8/17/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

8/17/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/22/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/22/2017

6/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/22/2017

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/22/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/11/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/25/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/25/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 08/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Celeste Lytle (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 39.33; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 08/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Filed by: County: Los Angeles; Principal: 2,610.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Status changed from Filed to Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/22/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Loantopia LLC DBA Shoreside Capital LLC, DBA Shoreside Loans LLC against Defendant Celeste Lytle on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loantopia LLC on 04/25/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $110.00 for a total of $2,610.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Celeste Lytle (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170426E8113 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170426E8113 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loantopia LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Celeste Lytle (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less