Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2019 at 12:51:48 (UTC).

LOANME INC. VS VICTOR MOLINA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VICTOR MOLINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY MORENO PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3299

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY MORENO PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC.

Defendant

MOLINA VICTOR

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/15/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/15/2019

11/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/15/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

9/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LoanMe Inc. on 09/19/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to plaintiff's request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 11/15/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: LoanMe Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/15/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Anthony Moreno Peters in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LoanMe Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: VICTOR MOLINA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less