This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2019 at 01:33:35 (UTC).

LOANME INC. VS SERMENO, GLORIA

Case Summary

On 12/21/2015 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SERMENO, GLORIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9085

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC.

Defendant

SERMENO GLORIA

Assignee

A-UNITED FINANCIAL

Not Classified By Court

CJ ACQUIRE LLC

 

Court Documents

Request for Court Order and Answer

11/14/2016: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

11/14/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Order on Request for Court Order - signed by Judge Tony Richardson

12/2/2016: Order on Request for Court Order - signed by Judge Tony Richardson

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

12/5/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/5/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/5/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - (Sacramento)

6/16/2017: Writ of Execution - (Sacramento)

Writ - Return

4/30/2018: Writ - Return

Assignment of Judgment - No longer assignee, new assignee is A-United Financial

6/27/2018: Assignment of Judgment - No longer assignee, new assignee is A-United Financial

Assignment of Judgment

6/27/2018: Assignment of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • Assignment of Judgment No longer assignee, new assignee is A-United Financial; Filed by: CJ Acquire, LLC (Non-Party); As to: (LOANME INC.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by: A-United Financial (Assignee); As to: (LOANME INC.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Sacramento): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 04/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0014041 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Sacramento)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (LOANME INC.) (Plaintiff); Interest: 108.26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (LOANME INC.) against Defendant (SERMENO, GLORIA) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LOANME INC. on 12/21/2015 (from ALH15G09085) for the principal amount of $2,207.50 for a total of $2,207.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: (LOANME INC.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (LOANME INC.) . MAYRA ARELLANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • AGREEMENT TO SETTLE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SERMENO, GLORIA) BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE MANAGER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 COSTS OF $ 57.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH256899019. HEARING SET FOR 03/14/16 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.