This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 01:12:20 (UTC).

LOANME INC. VS NOORI, FARNAZ

Case Summary

On 09/28/2015 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NOORI, FARNAZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TONY L. RICHARDSON and TONY RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6971

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

Judge

TONY RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC.

Defendant

NOORI FARNAZ

Assignee

A-UNITED FINANCIAL

Not Classified By Court

CJ ACQUIRE LLC

 

Court Documents

Request for Court Order and Answer

10/17/2016: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

10/25/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Order on Request for Court Order - signed by Judge Tony Richardson

11/28/2016: Order on Request for Court Order - signed by Judge Tony Richardson

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/29/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

11/29/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/24/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

4/28/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Writ - Return

3/27/2018: Writ - Return

Assignment of Judgment - non-party not assignee

6/27/2018: Assignment of Judgment - non-party not assignee

Assignment of Judgment

6/27/2018: Assignment of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Annabelle G. Cortezeffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- A-United Financial (Assignee): Organization Name changed from CJ Aquire, LLC to A-United Financial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketAddress for A-United Financial (Assignee) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketA-United Financial (Assignee) Removed - Stricken 06/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment non-party not assignee; Filed by: A-United Financial (Assignee); As to: (LOANME INC.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: A-United Financial (Assignee); As to: (LOANME INC.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (LOANME INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 02:50P M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. TONY L. RICHARDSON, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY ANTHONY PALACIO . DEFENDANT APPEARING . SETTLEMENT REACHED. NO JUDGMENT TO ISSUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 TO ENFORCE THE FULL TERMS OF SETTLEMENT. .. THE DEFENDANT AGREES TO PAY PLAINTIFF $2607.50 IN MONTHLY PAYMENTS OF $50.00 STARTING MARCH 25, 2016 AND CONTINUING ON THE 25TH OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER UNTIL FULLY PAID (5 DAY GRACE PERIOD). THE WRITTEN AGREEMENT IS SIGNED AND FILED WITH CONFORMED COPIES GIVEN TO BOTH PARTIES IN OPEN COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketRECEIVED FEES FROM (NOORI, FARNAZ) IN THE SUM OF $ 11.50 FOR FAX FILING FEES . RECEIPT # ALH258280011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (NOORI, FARNAZ) FOR REJECTION OF FAX FILING REJECT OF REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL - PLAINTIFF'S ADDRESS IS INCOMPLETE. SC-112A - THE FORM IS NOT FILLED OUT PROPERLY. ALL FAX FILED DOCUMENTS MUST BE SUBMITTED WITH A FACSIMILE TRANSMISSION COVER SHEET (JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM SUBMITTED ON 12/02/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT RECEIVED AND FILED BY (NOORI, FARNAZ) . RECEIPT # ALH258280011 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (NOORI, FARNAZ) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 02/18/16 AT 01:30P M. IN DEPT. NE2 , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (NOORI, FARNAZ) BY SUB-SERVING HENRY MEYER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/17/15 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NE2 COSTS OF $ 57.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH256899033. HEARING SET FOR 12/17/15 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less