This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 16:21:33 (UTC).

LOANME INC VS KEENAN SMITH

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEENAN SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5764

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC

1900 S. State College Blvd Suite 300

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendant

SMITH KEENAN

Torrance, CA 90504

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/15/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/16/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

7/3/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/15/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Writ of Execution - (LOS ANGELES)

7/3/2017: Writ of Execution - (LOS ANGELES)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/9/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: JOHN DOE, CO-OCCUP.

1/26/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: JOHN DOE, CO-OCCUP.

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/15/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 02/15/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/15/2017: Minute Order of 02/15/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2017
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0014768 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 80.48; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: JOHN DOE, CO-OCCUP.: Result: Result Date: 02/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/15/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 02/15/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Loanme Inc against Defendant KEENAN SMITH on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loanme Inc on 12/16/2016 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $110.00 for a total of $2,610.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: JOHN DOE, CO-OCCUP. Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: KEENAN SMITH (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/23/17; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0007617 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/15/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: KEENAN SMITH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less