This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 01:32:18 (UTC).

LOANME INC. VS GUIZAR, MELVA

Case Summary

On 06/10/2015 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUIZAR, MELVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUCE E. MITCHELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4150

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRUCE E. MITCHELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC.

Defendant

GUIZAR MELVA

Assignee

GIMBAL CAPITAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

KENOSIAN JOHN P.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/9/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ - Return - Writ - Return Los Angeles County Sheriff

11/19/2018: Writ - Return - Writ - Return Los Angeles County Sheriff

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1/7/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

1/9/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

5/30/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Riverside)

5/31/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Riverside)

Notice of Rejection

5/31/2018: Notice of Rejection

Substitution of Attorney

4/23/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

4/26/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Assignment of Judgment

4/23/2018: Assignment of Judgment

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/10/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - ($57.50)

7/8/2015: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - ($57.50)

Minute Order

8/27/2015: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/1/2015: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Motion to Vacate (name extension) - and Declaration

9/24/2015: Motion to Vacate (name extension) - and Declaration

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/20/2015: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

10/21/2015: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

Notice of Rejection

1/18/2018: Notice of Rejection

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Writ of Execution (Riverside); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Gimbal Capital, Inc (Assignee); As to: MELVA GUIZAR (Defendant); Costs: 275.00; Interest: 786.26; Service Date: 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Gimbal Capital, Inc (Assignee); As to: MELVA GUIZAR (Defendant); Costs: 210.00; Interest: 680.65; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 11/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Writ - Return Los Angeles County Sheriff ( Partially Satisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (LOANME INC.) (Plaintiff); As to: MELVA GUIZAR (Defendant); Costs: 185.00; Interest: 612.02; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 09/18/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Notice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Gimbal Capital, Inc (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:21A M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. BRUCE E. MITCHELL, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT: . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MOTION IS DENIED. . JUDGMENT TO STAND. . DEFENDANT DID NOT APPEAR AT THE HEARING. . CLERK SHALL GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (LOANME INC.) . JANETTE VELEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (GUIZAR, MELVA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/20/15 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # ALH427761014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (GUIZAR, MELVA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:45P M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. BRUCE E. MITCHELL, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY JANETTE VELEZ . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . THE MATTER IS TRANSFERRED FORTHWITH TO DEPT 3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/27/15 . FOR (LOANME INC.) . AGAINST (GUIZAR, MELVA) . PRINCIPAL $ 2500.00 . COSTS $ 107.50 . TOTAL $ 2607.50 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GUIZAR, MELVA) BY SUB-SERVING FRANCISCA GUIZAR . COSTS OF $ 57.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH256899031. HEARING SET FOR 08/27/15 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less