This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 10:28:47 (UTC).

LOANME INC VS ESTEVAN VARGAS

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESTEVAN VARGAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2286

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOANME INC DBA

1900 S. State College Blvd Suite 300

Anaheim, CA 92806

LOANME INC

1900 S. State College Blvd Suite 300

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendant

VARGAS ESTEVAN

Torrance, CA 90503

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

10/13/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/13/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/14/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 10/13/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/13/2016: Minute Order of 10/13/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/13/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/16/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/27/2016: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - (LOS ANGELES)

1/6/2017: Writ of Execution - (LOS ANGELES)

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

1/6/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/26/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

RETURNED MAIL - (notice of entry of judgment)

10/28/2016: RETURNED MAIL - (notice of entry of judgment)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2017
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 2,560.00; Interest: 43.48; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0008209 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 43.48; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL (notice of entry of judgment); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 10/13/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 10/13/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Loanme Inc against Defendant ESTEVAN VARGAS on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loanme Inc on 07/26/2016 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $60.00 for a total of $2,560.00.; Other: Default judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: ESTEVAN VARGAS (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0003068 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: ESTEVAN VARGAS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.