This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 14:43:09 (UTC).

LOANME INC VS DON JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 03/24/2017 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DON JOHNSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2374

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC

1900 S. State College Blvd Suite 300,

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendant

JOHNSON DON

Hawthorne, CA 90250

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/24/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Unknown

8/11/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/11/2017: Unknown

(Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

8/11/2017: (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/11/2017

8/11/2017: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/11/2017

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

6/22/2017: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

[Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

6/22/2017: [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/23/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/23/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/23/2017: Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/23/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/10/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Small Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment) of 08/11/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 08/11/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/11/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loanme Inc on 03/24/2017, judgment entered on 05/23/2017 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loanme Inc on 03/24/2017, judgment entered on 05/23/2017 as to DON JOHNSON is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Filed by: DON JOHNSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result: Result Date: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: DON JOHNSON (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/10/2017; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011195 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: DON JOHNSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less