This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2020 at 01:37:35 (UTC).

LOANME INC. VS DANIEL PEREZ

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0961

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC.

Defendant

PEREZ DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

2/19/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

2/19/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/19/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/17/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

5/7/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/2/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Attachment - Attachment

7/20/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/16/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/16/2020

9/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/16/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LoanMe Inc. on 02/19/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to DANIEL PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/16/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/16/2020 at 03:00 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 09/16/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/23/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LoanMe Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL PEREZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/07/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LoanMe Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL PEREZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOANME INC. is a litigant