Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 01:44:27 (UTC).

LOANME INC VS CYNTHIA VIGUERAS

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CYNTHIA VIGUERAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3781

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC

1900 S. State College Blvd Suite 300

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendant

VIGUERAS CYNTHIA

Long Beach, CA 90810

 

Court Documents

(Los Angeles)

9/6/2017: (Los Angeles)

Unknown

9/5/2017: Unknown

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/30/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/30/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/30/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 06/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/30/2017: Minute Order of 06/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/29/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 42.90; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 06/30/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Loanme Inc against Defendant Cynthia Vigueras on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loanme Inc on 03/29/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $110.00 for a total of $2,610.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Cynthia Vigueras (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/24/2017; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0013217 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Cynthia Vigueras (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOANME INC. is a litigant