This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 00:58:57 (UTC).

LOANME INC VS CASEY SAMPSON

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASEY SAMPSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3873

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC

1900 S. State College Blvd Suite 300

Anaheim, CA 92806

Defendant

SAMPSON CASEY

Norwalk, CA 90650

 

Court Documents

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

12/13/2018: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

12/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

3/18/2019: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

3/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

4/26/2019: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/26/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/30/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

10/22/2018: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/22/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/22/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/22/2018

10/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/22/2018

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/3/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from CASEY SAMPSON (Defendant) to CASEY SAMPSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Loanme Inc against Defendant CASEY SAMPSON on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loanme Inc on 08/03/2018 for the principal amount of $2,215.00 for a total of $2,215.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: As to: CASEY SAMPSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Dismissal entered on 10/22/2018, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Address for Loanme Inc (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/22/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Updated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims): Status Date changed from 10/23/2018 to 10/22/2018; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Updated -- Small Claims Settlement Agreement: Status Date changed from 10/23/2018 to 10/22/2018; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/22/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loanme Inc on 08/03/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: CASEY SAMPSON (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/01/2018; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: CASEY SAMPSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less