This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2017 at 12:28:02 (UTC).

LOANME INC VS AMBER NORTON

Case Summary

On 10/04/2016 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMBER NORTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0734

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC

Defendant

NORTON AMBER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order of 11/10/2016

11/10/2016: Minute Order of 11/10/2016

Minute Order - (Court Order)

11/10/2016: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/8/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Judge Randolph Rogers

11/4/2016: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Judge Randolph Rogers

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/28/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/28/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

11/28/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/28/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

3/7/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/6/2017: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/4/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Balance: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Payment: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Amount: $25.00 Receipt: AV-2017-0002170 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 35.34; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Entered by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 11/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14 updated: Result Date to 11/28/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Loanme Inc against Defendant Amber Norton on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Loanme Inc on 10/04/2016 for the principal amount of $1,400.00 and costs of $100.00 for a total of $1,500.00.; Other: Judgment is stayed for 30 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL - Minute Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 11/10/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Amber Norton (Defendant); Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Judge Randolph Rogers; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: AV-2016-0001055 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Loanme Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Amber Norton (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Brian C. Yep at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A14

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOANME INC. is a litigant