This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 12:24:58 (UTC).

LLORREITTA BERRY VS VASKEN MANOUGIAN

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 LLORREITTA BERRY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VASKEN MANOUGIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN C YEP and BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0017

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRIAN C YEP

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERRY LLORREITTA

Lancaster, CA 93536

Defendant

MANOUGIAN VASKEN

Palmdale, CA 93551

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

8/8/2016: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/12/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/6/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/15/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/8/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2016
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Brian C. Yep at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2016 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A10 updated: Result Date to 08/08/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Llorreitta Berry against Defendant Vasken Manougian on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Llorreitta Berry on 06/06/2016 for the principal amount of $500.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $615.00.; Other: Judgment is stayed for 30 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 08/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Vasken Manougian (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 06/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Llorreitta Berry (Plaintiff); As to: Vasken Manougian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Llorreitta Berry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Llorreitta Berry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AV-2016-0000036 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Brian C Yep at Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse in Department A10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/08/2016 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A10

    Read MoreRead Less