This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 01:23:33 (UTC).

LJD PROPER, A CORPORATION VS FARIBORZ FRED HANASSAB

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 LJD PROPER, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FARIBORZ FRED HANASSAB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3126

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LJD PROPER A CORPORATION

Defendant

HANASSAB FARIBORZ FRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEHJATNIA RUSSELL F

Defendant Attorney

HANASSAB FRED

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement;) of 08/25/2021

8/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement;) of 08/25/2021

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

8/25/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement;)

8/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement;)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

6/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/23/2021

6/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/23/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/15/2020

9/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/15/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 06/30/2020

6/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of 06/30/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/15/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/28/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

11/5/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Fred Hanassab in Compliance to Code of Civil Procedure 430.41

10/11/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Fred Hanassab in Compliance to Code of Civil Procedure 430.41

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

8/12/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

7/30/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT

Complaint - Complaint

3/29/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/29/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/29/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/29/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by LJD PROPER, a corporation on 03/29/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement;) of 08/25/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement scheduled for 08/25/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 08/25/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement scheduled for 08/25/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 06/23/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 08/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: FARIBORZ FRED HANASSAB (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LJD PROPER, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FARIBORZ FRED HANASSAB (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LJD PROPER, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FARIBORZ FRED HANASSAB (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LJD PROPER, a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: FARIBORZ FRED HANASSAB (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03126    Hearing Date: June 30, 2020    Dept: 26

LJD Proper v. Hanassab, et al.

DEMURRER

(CCP §§ 430.31, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Fariborz Fred Hanassab, Esq.’s Demurrer to the Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Defendant to file and serve an Answer to the Complaint within 20 days’ notice of this order.

ANALYSIS:

On March 29, 2019, Plaintiff LJD Proper (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of contract and common counts against Defendant Fariborz Fred Hanassab, Esq. (“Defendant”), individually and dba The Law Office of Fred Hanassab. On July 3, 2019, Defendant filed the instant Demurrer to the Complaint. Plaintiff filed its Opposition on July 30, 2019. At the previous hearing, the Court continued the Demurrer because Defendant failed to submit a meet-and-confer declaration as required by Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41. On October 11, Defendant filed a supplemental declaration stating that he had been attempting to meet and confer with Plaintiff, but he “will file supplemental papers with the Court to advise whether the Parties are able or unable to reach an agreement to resolve the objections raised in the Demurrer.”

As of the hearing on November 5, 2019, the Court again found that no additional supplemental declaration has been filed by Defendant to explain to how the meet-and-confer effort has concluded. For this reason, the Court still could not consider the merits of the Demurrer at that time. The Court continued the hearing on the Demurrer, but to date, no supplemental declaration has been filed.

Therefore, the Demurrer to the Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Plaintiff to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC03126    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: 94

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

(CCP § 430.10)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Fariborz Fred Hanassab, Esq.’s Demurrer to Complaint is CONTINUED to FEB. 11, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 94.

ANALYSIS:

I. Discussion

On March 29, 2019, Plaintiff LJD Proper (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of contract and common counts against Defendant Fariborz Fred Hanassab, Esq. (“Defendant”), individually and dba The Law Office of Fred Hanassab. On July 3, 2019, Defendant filed the instant Demurrer to the Complaint. Plaintiff filed its Opposition on July 30, 2019.

At the previous hearing, the Court continued the Demurrer because Defendant failed to submit a meet-and-confer declaration as required by CCP § 430.41. On October 11, Defendant filed a supplemental declaration stating that he had been attempting to meet and confer with Plaintiff, but he “will file supplemental papers with the Court to advise whether the Parties are able or unable to reach an agreement to resolve the objections raised in the Demurrer.” To date, no additional supplemental declaration has been filed by Defendant to explain to how the meet-and-confer effort has concluded. For this reason, the Court still cannot consider the merits of the Demurrer at this time.

II. Conclusion & Order

In light of the foregoing, the Demurrer is again CONTINUED to FEB. 11 2020, at 10:30 a.m. in Department 94.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANASSAB FRED