This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 01:18:13 (UTC).

LISAMARIE AMARO, ET AL. VS UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 LISAMARIE AMARO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4864

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMARO LISAMARIE

Pico Rivera, CA 90660

MORENO MICHAEL

Pico Rivera, CA 90660

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/10/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/4/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/28/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

1/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/15/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/15/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/15/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

1/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff LISAMARIE AMARO and Plaintiff MICHAEL MORENO against Defendant UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LISAMARIE AMARO, et al. on 09/28/2018 for the principal amount of $3,678.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $3,753.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/15/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/15/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LISAMARIE AMARO (Plaintiff); MICHAEL MORENO (Plaintiff); As to: UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED (Defendant); Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketNotice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Clerk; As to: LISAMARIE AMARO (Plaintiff); MICHAEL MORENO (Plaintiff); UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/15/2019 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/10/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion; Result Type from Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: LISAMARIE AMARO (Plaintiff); MICHAEL MORENO (Plaintiff); As to: UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/30/18; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED (Defendant) to UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LISAMARIE AMARO (Plaintiff); MICHAEL MORENO (Plaintiff); As to: UNITED PROPERTY MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.