This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 19:14:52 (UTC).

LISA PORUSH VS CALIX DRUG PHARMACY, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 LISA PORUSH filed an Other lawsuit against CALIX DRUG PHARMACY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0207

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PORUSH LISA

Respondent

CALIX DRUG PHARMACY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARDAVID JULIO ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE ...) of 06/29/2020

6/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE ...) of 06/29/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE ...)

6/29/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE ...)

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

5/19/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/23/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time)

3/12/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time

3/12/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/15/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

1/15/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Petition (name extension) - Petition FIRST PETITION BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE RELATED TO OUT OF STATE CASE; NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF CALIX DRUGS PHARMACY, INC.

1/15/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition FIRST PETITION BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE RELATED TO OUT OF STATE CASE; NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF CALIX DRUGS PHARMACY, INC.

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration PETITIONER/WIFE'S CONCURRENTLY FILED SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO COMPEL CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF CALIX DRUGS PHARMACY, INC., TO APPEAR AT D

1/15/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration PETITIONER/WIFE'S CONCURRENTLY FILED SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO COMPEL CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF CALIX DRUGS PHARMACY, INC., TO APPEAR AT D

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • Hearing11/03/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/03/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE ...) of 06/29/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE RELATED TO OUT OF STATE CASE scheduled for 06/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 06/29/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Petition FIRST PETITION BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE RELATED TO OUT OF STATE CASE; NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF CALIX DRUGS PHARMACY, INC., TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES scheduled for 06/29/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/29/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Petition FIRST PETITION BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE RELATED TO OUT OF STATE CASE; NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF CALIX DRUGS PHARMACY, INC., TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/29/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/12/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time scheduled for 03/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition FIRST PETITION BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE RELATED TO OUT OF STATE CASE; NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF CALIX DRUGS PHARMACY, INC., TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES scheduled for 05/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPetition FIRST PETITION BY PARTY FOR RELIEF IN DISCOVERY DISPUTE RELATED TO OUT OF STATE CASE; NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF CALIX DRUGS PHARMACY, INC., TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; Filed by: LISA PORUSH (Petitioner); As to: CALIX DRUG PHARMACY, INC. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration PETITIONER/WIFE'S CONCURRENTLY FILED SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO COMPEL CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF CALIX DRUGS PHARMACY, INC., TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; Filed by: LISA PORUSH (Petitioner); As to: CALIX DRUG PHARMACY, INC. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LISA PORUSH (Petitioner); As to: CALIX DRUG PHARMACY, INC. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP00207    Hearing Date: June 29, 2020    Dept: 26

Porush v. Calix Drug Company, Inc., et al.

PETITION TO COMPEL RESPONDENT’S CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN OUT-OF-STATE ACTION

(CCP § 2029.300 et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Lisa Porush’s Petition to Compel Respondent’s Custodian of Records to Appear at Deposition and Produce Documents in Out-Of-State Action is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PETITIONER FILING AND SERVING AN AMENDED PETITION PURSUANT TO THE CORRECT STATUTORY AUTHORITY.

ANALYSIS:

On January 15, 2020, Petitioner Lisa Porush (“Petitioner”) filed this Petition to Compel Respondent Califax Drug Company, Inc.’s (“Respondent”) custodian of records to appear for deposition and produce documents pursuant to the subpoena issued in the dissolution proceeding between Petitioner Lisa Porush and Daniel Porush, being held in Palm Beach County, Florida (Case No. 502018DR005043XXXXSB). To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

The instant Petition is brought pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 2025.450. Authority to compel a California resident or corporation to submit to discovery in a foreign jurisdiction is not given under this statute. Rather, the Petition must be made under the Interstate and International Depositions and Discovery Act, starting at Code of Civil Procedure section 2029.100, et seq.

Therefore, the Petition is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PETITIONER FILING AND SERVING AN AMENDED PETITION PURSUANT TO THE CORRECT STATUTORY AUTHORITY.

Court clerk to give notice.