This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 17:46:07 (UTC).

LISA MCCARTER VS ROBYN FULLER

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 LISA MCCARTER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROBYN FULLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5089

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCARTER LISA

Defendant

FULLER ROBYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAY WILLIAM DEREK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

1/23/2018: Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing

Proof of Personal Service

12/22/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

12/20/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

12/20/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/20/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 09/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 06/19/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Lisa McCarter (Plaintiff); As to: Robyn Fuller (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Robyn Fuller; On the Complaint filed by Lisa McCarter on 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Lisa McCarter (Plaintiff); As to: Robyn Fuller (Defendant); Service Date: 12/20/2017; Service Cost: 52.59; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lisa McCarter (Plaintiff); As to: Robyn Fuller (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lisa McCarter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Lisa McCarter, as trustee of the Wright Gifting Case No.:Trust; COMPLAINT FOR: Plaintiff,

1) BREACH OF CONTRACT

Vs. 2) FRAUD

3) COMMON COUNT-MONEY HAD

Robyn Fuller, an individual; and DOES 1 AND RECEIVED

through 10, inclusive, Cwi -0 LO,_ 00) — OVEL.

Defendant.

TO THE HONORABLE COURT: Plaintiff Lisa McCarter (hereinafter “Plaintiff”), alleges as follows:

PARTIES

1. Plaintiff is the trustee of the Wright Gifting Trust (hereinafter “Trust”), a trust created by Norma ‘Wright and Gene Wright. Plaintiff resides in Claremont, California, in the County of Los Angeles.

2. Plaintiff files this suit solely in her capacity as trustee of the Trust.

3. Defendant Robyn Fuller (hereinafter “Defendant™) is an individual. Plaintiff is informed and believes and based thereon alleges that Defendant resides in Azusa, California, in the County of Los Angeles.

4. Plaintiff does not know the true names and capacities of those defendants sued herein as Does 1 through 10, inclusive and therefore sues those defendants by such fictitious names. Plaintiff

will amend this complaint to allege their true names and capacities when ascertained. Each of the