This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 13:41:46 (UTC).

LING LIANG VS JACOB BINSTOK

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 LING LIANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACOB BINSTOK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM MCTAGGART and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2299

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIANG LING

Las Vegas, NV 89107

Defendant

BINSTOK JACOB DBA JB TRANSPORTERS

Los Angeles, CA 90016

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/23/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/23/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

6/15/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)

6/15/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)

Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/18/2017: Minute Order of 05/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/19/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/18/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

5/18/2017: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/2/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment: Result: Result Date: 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/21/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion to 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Jacob Binstok (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Notice of Small Claims Appeal (Trial De Novo); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Appeal - Notice of appeal of small claim- CCP 116.760; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0014133 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 07/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 10/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ling Liang against Defendant Jacob Binstok DBA JB Transporters on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ling Liang on 03/23/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $5,075.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $75.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Jacob Binstok DBA JB Transporters. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Address for Ling Liang (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Ling Liang (Plaintiff); As to: Jacob Binstok (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ling Liang (Plaintiff); As to: Jacob Binstok (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Ling Liang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011074 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less