This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2023 at 09:07:41 (UTC).

LINDEN PROPERTIES, INC. VS ALBARRACIN, MABEL

Case Summary

On 12/07/2016 LINDEN PROPERTIES, INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ALBARRACIN, MABEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5516

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDEN PROPERTIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

ALBA HOLDINGS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ALBARRACIN MABEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN EARLE H.

Defendant Attorney

VAN PARYS NICHOLAS H.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketOrder Case file destroyed per section(s) 71008 and/or 68152 of the Government Code. Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Case Destroyed pursuant to California Government Code Section 68151 and 68153.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 145.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. PICKED UP IN PERSON . RECEIPT # PAS443036008 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 100.00 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (LINDEN PROPERTIES, INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION. MISSING APPLICATION , JUDGMENT DEBTORS DO NOT MATCH JUDGMENT. #17 AND 18 REQUIRED. RETURNED VIA ATTORNEY SERVICE SUBMITTED ON 02/28/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA , HON. WILLIAM D. DODSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING WITH COUNSEL, EARLE H. COHEN . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING WITH COUNSEL, NICHOLAS H. VAN PARYS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (ALBARRACIAN, MABEL) AN INDIVIDUAL ATTORNEY . RECEIPT # PAS512985008 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • DocketORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (LINDEN PROPERTIES, INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. NEA FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # PAS525232005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALBA HOLDINGS, LLC) A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERRATA FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS623737002. Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 06/07/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less