This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 07:49:31 (UTC).

LINDEE DANIEL VS ARTHUR L. HERMAN FAMILY, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2017 LINDEE DANIEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARTHUR L HERMAN FAMILY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4565

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL LINDEE

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Defendant

ARTHUR L. HERMAN FAMILY LLC

2301 Carlyle Ave,

Santa Monica, CA 90402

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/23/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2018

2/23/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/23/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Dismissal

5/2/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

4/18/2018: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/6/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/7/2017: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

12/5/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

9/22/2017: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/14/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/14/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017

8/14/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

8/7/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/7/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Lindee Daniel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/13/2018 08:30 AM at Department N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Updated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: blank; Result Date changed from 12/06/2017 to 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2018 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion was rescheduled to 06/14/2018 08:30 AM at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Arthur L. Herman Family, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Entered by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Lindee Daniel (Plaintiff); As to: Arthur L. Herman Family, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Arthur L. Herman Family, LLC (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lindee Daniel (Plaintiff); As to: Arthur L. Herman Family, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0014363 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less