This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2020 at 05:33:49 (UTC).

LINDA KAY KRANZ, ET AL. VS RECON INVESTMENT FUND B, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 LINDA KAY KRANZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RECON INVESTMENT FUND B, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4258

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KRANZ JACK

Burbank, CA 91505

KRANZ LINDA KAY

Burbank, CA 91505

Defendants

RECON INVESTMENT FUND B LLC AND GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL LLC

26650 The Old Road, Suite 300

Valencia, CA 91381

RECON INVESTMENT FUND B LLC

GREAT WESTERN CAPITAL LLC

AMBER INVESTMENT GROUP INC.

2102 Century Park Ln St 1-108

Los Angeles, CA 90067

GREAT WESTERN CAPITOL LLC

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Jeff Brandolino

2/17/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Jeff Brandolino

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Jeff Brandolino

2/17/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Jeff Brandolino

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Jeff Brandcling

2/17/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - by Jeff Brandcling

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/17/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 02/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/17/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/6/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/9/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/21/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/21/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/19/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

12/19/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/4/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/4/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

11/1/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/1/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4/20/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 04/28/2017 ; Status Date changed from 04/21/2017 to 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 04/21/2017 ; Status Date changed from 02/17/2017 to 04/21/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Linda Kay Kranz (Plaintiff); Jack Kranz (Plaintiff); As to: Recon Investment Fund B, LLC (Defendant); Great Western Capital, LLC (Defendant); Amber Investment Group Inc. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jeff Brandolino; Filed by: Recon Investment Fund B, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Jeff Brandolino; Filed by: Great Western Capital, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 02/17/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 02/17/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Linda Kay Kranz (Plaintiff); Jack Kranz (Plaintiff); As to: Recon Investment Fund B, LLC and Great Western Capital, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/03/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Linda Kay Kranz (Plaintiff); Jack Kranz (Plaintiff); As to: Recon Investment Fund B, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1161101E4985 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161101E4985 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/30/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Linda Kay Kranz (Plaintiff); Jack Kranz (Plaintiff); As to: Recon Investment Fund B, LLC and Great Western Capital, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great Western Capital, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMBER INVESTMENT GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant