Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2017 at 10:37:57 (UTC).

LINDA JOCELYN MOLINA-MARTINEZ VS DANIEL GERARDO

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 LINDA JOCELYN MOLINA-MARTINEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL GERARDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5566

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOLINA-MARTINEZ LINDA JOCELYN

Ontario, CA 91762

Defendant

GERARDO DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/05/2017

9/5/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/05/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/5/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

$35.00

7/31/2017: $35.00

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/19/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/19/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/05/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 09/05/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service $35.00; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Linda Jocelyn Molina-Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Gerardo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Linda Jocelyn Molina-Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0015262 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/05/2017 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Address for Linda Jocelyn Molina-Martinez (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less