This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 01:17:03 (UTC).

LINARES, GERARDO M. VS G&G FINANCIAL GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 12/30/2015 LINARES, GERARDO M filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against G G FINANCIAL GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9305

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LINARES GERARDO M.

LINARES PATRICIA

Defendant

G&G FINANCIAL GROUP INC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/30/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order

4/27/2016: Minute Order

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

5/19/2016: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

Request for Court Order and Answer

6/22/2016: Request for Court Order and Answer

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/28/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/28/2016

6/28/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/28/2016

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/01/2016

9/1/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/01/2016

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

9/19/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

9/29/2016: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/3/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

10/3/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/03/2016

10/3/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 10/03/2016

Order on Request for Court Order

10/21/2016: Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

10/21/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/7/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

12/7/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/14/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

RETURNED MAIL - CORRESPONDENCE FROM THE SECRETARY OF STATES OFFICE RE: SUBSTITUTE SERVICE BY MAIL

1/23/2017: RETURNED MAIL - CORRESPONDENCE FROM THE SECRETARY OF STATES OFFICE RE: SUBSTITUTE SERVICE BY MAIL

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL CORRESPONDENCE FROM THE SECRETARY OF STATES OFFICE RE: SUBSTITUTE SERVICE BY MAIL; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/07/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 12/07/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (LINARES, GERARDO M.); Plaintiff (LINARES, PATRICIA) against Defendant (G&G FINANCIAL GROUP INC) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LINARES, GERARDO M. on 12/30/2015 (from ALH15G09305) for the principal amount of $3,495.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $3,585.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: GERARDO M. LINARES (Plaintiff); PATRICIA LINARES (Plaintiff); As to: (G&G FINANCIAL GROUP INC) (Defendant); Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/31/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/28/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2016 at 01:30 PM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $2.00; Balance: $2.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $2.00 Receipt: AH-2016-0000968 (Cash)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: GERARDO M. LINARES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 04:00P M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. TONY L. RICHARDSON PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFFS PRESENT. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 06/28/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NE2 . THE CLAIM REMAINS UNSERVED. PLAINTIFFS TO EFFECT PROPER SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH427761012. HEARING SET FOR 04/27/16 AT 04:00 PM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 2.50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # ALH427761012 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.