This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2019 at 01:08:58 (UTC).

LINA FRAIFALD VS SKY READY MIX INC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2018 LINA FRAIFALD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SKY READY MIX INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW E. COOPER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1553

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW E. COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRAIFALD LINA

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Defendant

SKY READY MIX INC

42610 4Th St E,

Lancaster, CA 93535

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/9/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/09/2018

8/9/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/09/2018

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/6/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/6/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/6/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/09/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 08/09/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew E. Cooper in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lina FRAIFALD (Plaintiff); As to: Sky Ready Mix Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sky Ready Mix Inc is a litigant