This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 14:31:55 (UTC).

LILLIAN WINGS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WINGS TRUST DATED JULY 1, 2016 VS ROXANA KING

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 LILLIAN WINGS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WINGS TRUST DATED JULY 1, 2016 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROXANA KING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0351

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LILLIAN WINGS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WINGS TRUST DATED JULY 1 2016

Defendant

KING ROXANA

San Dimas, CA 91773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ALLEN KENT

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

3/26/2018: Writ - Return

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/27/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/27/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/6/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

3/6/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Possession (Mailed)

3/6/2018: Writ of (name extension) - Possession (Mailed)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/14/2018: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

2/14/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/15/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Roxana King)

2/15/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Roxana King)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/14/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/14/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Lillian Wings As Trustee of The Wings Trust Dated July 1, 2016 against Defendant Roxana King on the Complaint filed by Lillian Wings As Trustee of The Wings Trust Dated July 1, 2016 on 02/14/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 312 Calle Moreno, San Dimas, CA 91773 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Lillian Wings As Trustee of The Wings Trust Dated July 1, 2016 (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 96.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession (Mailed); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lillian Wings As Trustee of The Wings Trust Dated July 1, 2016 (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 02/14/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Lillian Wings As Trustee of The Wings Trust Dated July 1, 2016 (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Roxana King (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Roxana King; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Lillian Wings As Trustee of The Wings Trust Dated July 1, 2016 on 02/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Lillian Wings As Trustee of The Wings Trust Dated July 1, 2016 (Plaintiff); As to: Roxana King (Defendant); Service Date: 02/14/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lillian Wings As Trustee of The Wings Trust Dated July 1, 2016 (Plaintiff); As to: Roxana King (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lillian Wings As Trustee of The Wings Trust Dated July 1, 2016 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN ALLEN KENT