This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 01:29:22 (UTC).

LILIANA MELCHOR MARTINEZ, ET AL. VS RAY AUTRY HEIGHT

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 LILIANA MELCHOR MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAY AUTRY HEIGHT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4761

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PAREDES JOSE

MARTINEZ LILIANA MELCHOR

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

HEIGHT RAY AUTRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CASADO KELLY LAWRENCE

1541 Wilshire Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90017

COLE ONICA VALLE

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS VI

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

YEUNG MICHAEL LUNG

YEUNG MICHAEL L

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

10/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Jury Trial)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial

8/12/2021: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/12/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Conti...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Conti...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/23/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/17/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/26/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

5/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 05/13/2021

5/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 05/13/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

3/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/12/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/20/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/25/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF, LILIANA MELCHOR MARTINEZ TO APPEAR FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS;

1/19/2021: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF, LILIANA MELCHOR MARTINEZ TO APPEAR FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS;

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/7/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/5/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

12/23/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS USE OF IRRELEVANT AND PREJUDICIAL EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT AT TRIAL REGARDING THE REPT

5/6/2020: Motion in Limine (name extension) - Motion in Limine MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS USE OF IRRELEVANT AND PREJUDICIAL EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT AT TRIAL REGARDING THE REPT

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • Hearing11/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/03/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial: Filed By: Jose Paredes (Plaintiff),Liliana Melchor Martinez (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Conti...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/13/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Jury Trial scheduled for 08/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10/04/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Filed by: Liliana Melchor Martinez (Plaintiff); Jose Paredes (Plaintiff); As to: Ray Autry Height (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Kelly Lawrence Casado (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for exemption from mandatory electronic filing and service; Filed by: Liliana Melchor Martinez (Plaintiff); Jose Paredes (Plaintiff); Charge Fee ?: NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketOrder of exemption from electronic filing and service; Filed by: Liliana Melchor Martinez (Plaintiff); Jose Paredes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Liliana Melchor Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Liliana Melchor Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jose Paredes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jose Paredes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Liliana Melchor Martinez (Plaintiff); Jose Paredes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC14761    Hearing Date: May 13, 2021    Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF LILIANA MELCHOR MARTINEZ TO APPEAR FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Ray Autry Height

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

(CCP § 2032.210, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Ray Autry Height’s Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Appear for Physical Examination and Request for Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of May 11, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of May 11, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

On December 11, 2018, Plaintiffs Liliana Melchor Martinez (“Martinez”) and Jose Paredes (“Paredes”) filed an action alleging general negligence and motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Ray Autry Height (“Defendant”). Defendant filed an Answer on January 28, 2019. On February 7, 2019, Defendant filed an Amended Answer and Cross-Complaint against Plaintiff Martinez. Plaintiff Martinez filed an Answer to the Cross-Complaint on March 26, 2019.

On January 19, 2021, Defendant filed the instant Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Martinez to Appear for Examination and Request for Sanctions (the “Motion”).

At the initial March 11 hearing, the Court noted that the Motion was incomplete. (3/11/21 Minute Order.) Specifically, the Motion referenced the supporting declaration of Victor M. Campos, but no such declaration was filed. (Id.) The Court continued the hearing to May 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. and ordered Defendant to file and serve a copy of the declaration at least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing. (Id.)

On March 17, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement of the Cross-Complaint. Defendant filed a request for dismissal of the Cross-Complaint on March 26, which was entered on April 5.

To date, Defendant has not filed a copy of the missing declaration. For this reason, Defendant’s Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

II. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Ray Autry Height’s Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Appear for Physical Examination and Request for Sanctions is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 18STLC14761    Hearing Date: March 11, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., March 11, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Martinez, et al. v. Height COMP. FILED: 12-11-18

CASE NUMBER: 18STLC14761 DISC. C/O: 07-17-21

NOTICE: OK MOTION C/O: 08-01-21

TRIAL DATE: 08-16-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF LILIANA MELCHOR MARTINEZ TO APPEAR FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Ray Autry Height

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO COMPEL INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION

(CCP § 2032.210, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Ray Autry Height’s Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Appear for Physical Examination and Request for Sanctions is CONTINUED TO MAY 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant must file and serve a copy of his declaration as requested herein.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of March 9, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 9, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On December 11, 2018, Plaintiffs Liliana Melchor Martinez (“Martinez”) and Jose Paredes (“Paredes”) filed an action alleging general negligence and motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Ray Autry Height (“Defendant”). Defendant filed an Answer on January 28, 2019. On February 7, 2019, Defendant filed an Amended Answer and Cross-Complaint against Plaintiff Martinez. Plaintiff Martinez filed an Answer to the Cross-Complaint on March 26, 2019.

On January 19, 2021, Defendant filed the instant Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff Martinez to Appear for Examination and Request for Sanctions (the “Motion”). No opposition was filed.

As an initial matter, the Court notes that the Motion references the declaration of Victor M. Campos filed in support of this Motion. After reviewing the docket, the Court finds this declaration is not on file. Defendant is ordered to file a copy of this declaration for the court’s review, and to serve a copy if he has not already one so, at least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Ray Autry Height’s Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Appear for Physical Examination and Request for Sanctions is CONTINUED TO MAY 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant must file and serve a copy of his declaration as requested herein.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASADO KELLY LAWRENCE