This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 12:42:01 (UTC).

LIJUAN WU VS KKC FOODLAND, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 LIJUAN WU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KKC FOODLAND, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7929

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WU LIJUAN

CENTRAL ESCROW GROUP LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CENTRAL ESCROW GROUP LLC

KKC FOODLAND INC.

YE DEJIN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KKC FOODLAND INC.

YE DEJIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG JASON J.L.

Defendant Attorney

PEART MICHAEL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement - Separate Statement

2/4/2021: Separate Statement - Separate Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/4/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Jason J.L. Yang in support of to motion to compel further document production responses

2/4/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Jason J.L. Yang in support of to motion to compel further document production responses

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND RELATED CROSS CLAIMS

3/4/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND RELATED CROSS CLAIMS

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/4/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Answer - Answer

11/10/2020: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

10/19/2020: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

10/20/2020: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

10/26/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/18/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2023
  • Hearing09/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Hearing03/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: KKC Foodland, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Dejin Ye (Cross-Complainant); As to: Lijuan Wu (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOpposition TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND RELATED CROSS CLAIMS; Filed by: KKC Foodland, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: KKC Foodland, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Dejin Ye (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Plaintiff); As to: Dejin Ye (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Plaintiff); As to: KKC Foodland, Inc. (Defendant); Dejin Ye (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Jason J.L. Yang in support of to motion to compel further document production responses; Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Cross-Defendant); As to: KKC Foodland, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Dejin Ye (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Plaintiff); As to: Dejin Ye (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2020; Service Cost: 72.25; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Plaintiff); As to: KKC Foodland, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2020; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Plaintiff); As to: KKC Foodland, Inc. (Defendant); Dejin Ye (Defendant); Central Escrow Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Plaintiff); As to: KKC Foodland, Inc. (Defendant); Dejin Ye (Defendant); Central Escrow Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lijuan Wu (Plaintiff); As to: KKC Foodland, Inc. (Defendant); Dejin Ye (Defendant); Central Escrow Group LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC07929    Hearing Date: May 4, 2021    Dept: 26

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2031.310, 2023.010)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Lijuan Wu’s Motion to Compel Defendant KKC Foodland, Inc.’s Further Responses to Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents, Set One, and Request for Sanctions is GRANTED. DEFENDANT KKC FOODLAND, INC. IS TO SERVE FURTHER RESPONSES WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. DEFENDANT KKC FOODLAND, INC. AND COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $810.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2031.310, 2023.010)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Lijuan Wu’s Motion to Compel Defendant KKC Foodland, Inc.’s Further Responses to Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents, Set One, and Request for Sanctions is GRANTED. DEFENDANT KKC FOODLAND, INC. IS TO SERVE FURTHER RESPONSES WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. DEFENDANT KKC FOODLAND, INC. AND COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE JOINTLY AND SEVERALLY ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $810.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL ESCROW GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEART MICHAEL ANTHONY