This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 12:05:16 (UTC).

LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1270

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC

LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC DBA LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

SMITH MD MPH KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOPER LUNDY & BOOKMAN P C

Defendant Attorneys

SONDHEIMER JOSHUA N

ADDAMS JENNIFER CELESTE

KAMALA D HARRIS ATTN GENERAL OF CA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/12/2016: Complaint

Summons

9/12/2016: Summons

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

10/7/2016: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

10/7/2016: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

Response (name extension) - GENERAL DENIAL

10/12/2016: Response (name extension) - GENERAL DENIAL

Other - (name extension)

12/22/2016: Other - (name extension)

Other - (name extension)

4/12/2017: Other - (name extension)

Notice (name extension) - of Reassignment of Counsel

11/13/2017: Notice (name extension) - of Reassignment of Counsel

Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials)

11/20/2017: Stipulation Re: Jury (Civil Trials)

Notice (name extension) - of Entry of Order Continuing Trial Date

11/30/2017: Notice (name extension) - of Entry of Order Continuing Trial Date

Notice of Settlement

5/25/2018: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

5/30/2018: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

6/6/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/13/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department 77 to Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 09/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 09/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC (Plaintiff); Settlement Type: Unconditional; Vacate Future Dates: No

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketA/C - ANSWER FILING REASON: TYPO CORRECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/12/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 09/12/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIGHTHOUSE HEALTHCARE CENTER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant