This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 18:18:00 (UTC).

LICHT, ANDREW VS AIR AL INC

Case Summary

On 11/27/2012 LICHT, ANDREW filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AIR AL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1791

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICHT ANDREW

Defendants

AIR AL INC C/O GIDEON ELLYAHU CE

AIR AL INC C/O GIDEON ELLYAHU CERTIFIED MAIL AGENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 12S01791 TO ING12SB1791

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/18/13 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (AIR AL INC) C/O GIDEON ELLYAHU, CERTIFIED MAIL AGENT . JACOB CHAI APPEARS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 005 RE: COURT SCHEDULED ON 01/17/2013 AT 130P IN DEPT 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (AIR AL INC) C/O GIDEON ELLYAHU, CERTIFIED MAIL AGENT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/17/13 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1121128E2075. HEARING SET FOR 01/17/13 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (AIR AL INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (AIR AL INC) C/O GIDEON ELLYAHU, CERTIFIED MAIL AGENT . RECEIPT # 1121128E2073 . 7011 2970 0002 7544 5048

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIR AL INC C/O GIDEON ELLYAHU CE is a litigant