This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2020 at 00:44:46 (UTC).

L&H LIMITED PATNERSHIP VS LUIS ANTONIO BOLANOS

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 L H LIMITED PATNERSHIP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS ANTONIO BOLANOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9464

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L&H LIMITED PATNERSHIP

Defendant

BOLANOS LUIS ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONG CHRISTOPHER FRANK

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF IRENE MIZUKI

10/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF IRENE MIZUKI

Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Non Opposition Re Motion To Compel

11/1/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Non Opposition Re Motion To Compel

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Resp...)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Resp...)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

11/19/2019: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/21/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

11/21/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/26/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice on Hearing About Court Fees

7/31/2018: Notice on Hearing About Court Fees

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/23/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

7/20/2018: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/25/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

7/13/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

7/13/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/13/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 01/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by L&H Limited Patnership on 07/13/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by L&H Limited Patnership as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: L&H Limited Patnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Not Entered: Name Extension: Not Entered; As To Parties changed from Luis Antonio Bolanos (Defendant) to Luis Antonio Bolanos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1834747 resulted in empty message

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by L&H Limited Patnership on 07/13/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by L&H Limited Patnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: L&H Limited Patnership (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Antonio Bolanos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 01/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Luis Antonio Bolanos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Luis Antonio Bolanos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Luis Antonio Bolanos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: L&H Limited Patnership (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Antonio Bolanos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: L&H Limited Patnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC09464    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT’S DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND FOR MONETARY AND TERMINATING SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290, 2031.300, 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff L&H Limited Partnership’s Motion to Compel Defendant’s Discovery Responses and for Monetary and Terminating Sanctions CONTINUED TO DEC. 12, at 8:30 a.m. in Department 94.

ANALYSIS:

I. Discussion

On October 15, 2019, Plaintiff Christina Bunch (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from and for Monetary and Terminating Sanctions against Defendant Luis Antonio Bolanos (“Defendant”).

The Court notes, however, that Plaintiff brings this Motion to Compel Discovery on four different discovery methods (form and special interrogatories, requests for production of documents, and requests for admission), but paid only one filing fee. It is improper to combine motions seeking different reliefs. Plaintiff should have filed one discovery motion for each of the four discovery methods: that is, (1) a motion to compel responses to form interrogatories, (2) a motion to compel responses to special interrogatories, (3) a motion to deem the truth of the matters specified in the requests for admission, and (4) a motion to compel responses to requests for production of documents.

“[P]ayment of filing fees is both mandatory and jurisdictional.” (Hu v. Silgan Containers Corp. (1999) 70 Cal.App.4th 1261, 1269.) “Unless otherwise provided by law, any document for which a filing fee is required under Government Code sections 68926 or 68927 must be accompanied at the time of filing by the required fee or an application for a waiver of court fees under rule 8.26.” (CRC 8.25(c).) Because Plaintiff has only paid one filing fee for the improperly combined Motion instead of four filing fees, the Court cannot consider the Motion at this time.

II. Conclusion & Order

Plaintiff is ordered to pay three additional filing fees at least 16 court days before the next hearing date. The Motion is CONTINUED TO DEC. 12, at 8:30 a.m. in Department 94.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.