Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 13:06:28 (UTC).

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY VS C. A. RASMUSSEN, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against C A RASMUSSEN, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4054

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

C. A. RASMUSSEN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAN SUSTEREN ADAM

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/3/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

6/17/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/17/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/17/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Lexington Insurance Company on 06/17/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Lexington Insurance Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lexington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/22/2020; Service Cost: 130.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Lexington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Lexington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lexington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: C. A. Rasmussen, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CA Rasmussen, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN SUSTEREN ADAM