This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2016 at 07:17:26 (UTC).

LEVY O.D., DOUGLAS E VS WEBBER M.D., TERRENCE J

Case Summary

On 02/29/2012 LEVY O D , DOUGLAS E filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEBBER M D , TERRENCE J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES K. HAHN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0579

  • Filing Date:

    02/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES K. HAHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVY O. D. DOUGLAS E

Defendants

WEBBER M. D. TERRENCE J

SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC LLC RUDY E. GRIMALDO- ADMISISTRATOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SM 12A00579 TO ING12SS0579

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEG , HON. JAMES K. HAHN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/18/12 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM WEG .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC, LLC) RUDY E. GRIMALDO- ADMISISTRATOR BY SUB-SERVING JOHN SUMERVILLE, BUSINESS OFFICE MANAGER & AUTHORIZED AGENT . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (WEBBER M.D., TERRENCE J) BY SUB-SERVING GLORIA WEBBER, WIFE . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # 1120301E0710 . HEARING SET FOR 04/18/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEG

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURGERY CENTER OF THE PACIFIC LLC RUDY E. GRIMALDO- ADMISISTRATOR is a litigant