Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2019 at 00:46:02 (UTC).

LEVON ZAZYAN VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by LEVON ZAZYAN against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6138

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAZYAN LEVON

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

2/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) 2nd Request for Postponement

2/4/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) 2nd Request for Postponement

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/6/2019: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/12/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/20/2019

2/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/20/2019

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/12/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Levon Zazyan on 11/26/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/20/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 02/20/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Levon Zazyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Updated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Levon Zazyan (Plaintiff) to Levon Zazyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) 2nd Request for Postponement: Filed By: Levon Zazyan (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 02/05/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) 2nd Request for Postponement; Filed by: Levon Zazyan (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Levon Zazyan (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 02/20/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Levon Zazyan (Plaintiff); As to: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less