This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 01:17:42 (UTC).

LEVON SIMITIAN, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ET AL. VS CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL CHUNG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 LEVON SIMITIAN, BY AND THROUGH GUARDIAN AD LITEM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL CHUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5723

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEPANYAN AGAVNI

SIMITIAN STEPHAN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CHUNG CHRISTOPHER SAMUEL

MALAGON MARISAL GUADALUPPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN

BERNSTEIN BARRY S.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMAS BRYAN M.

MAXWELL KIMBERLEY

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

3/1/2021: Answer - Answer

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Answer - Answer

1/25/2021: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

1/20/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/20/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Answer - Answer

1/15/2021: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

1/15/2021: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

11/16/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

1/7/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/7/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/10/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/8/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/8/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

7/8/2020: Complaint - Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • Hearing01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 11/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Levon Simitian, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Stephan Simitian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Agavni Stepanyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Marisal Guadaluppe Malagon (Cross-Defendant); As to: Christopher Samuel Chung (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Christopher Samuel Chung (Cross-Defendant); As to: Marisal Guadaluppe Malagon (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Christopher Samuel Chung (Defendant); As to: Marisal Guadaluppe Malagon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christopher Samuel Chung (Defendant); As to: Marisal Guadaluppe Malagon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 07/08/2020 to 07/08/2020; Result Date changed from 07/14/2020 to 07/14/2020; As To Parties changed from Marisal Guadaluppe Malagon (Defendant), Christopher Samuel Chung (Defendant) to Stephan Simitian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Agavni Stepanyan (Plaintiff),Stephan Simitian (Plaintiff),Levon Simitian, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Levon Simitian, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Agavni Stepanyan (Plaintiff); Stephan Simitian (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Samuel Chung (Defendant); Marisal Guadaluppe Malagon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Levon Simitian, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Agavni Stepanyan (Plaintiff); Stephan Simitian (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Samuel Chung (Defendant); Marisal Guadaluppe Malagon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Levon Simitian, by and through guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Agavni Stepanyan (Plaintiff); Stephan Simitian (Plaintiff); As to: Christopher Samuel Chung (Defendant); Marisal Guadaluppe Malagon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS BRYAN M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAXWELL KIMBERLEY